This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 09:28:13 (UTC).

Darryl Jeff Robinson VS Amareece Shelton

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Darryl Jeff Robinson filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Amareece Shelton. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Ash, Lori and Covil, Max. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5665

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Ash, Lori

Covil, Max

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Darryl Jeff Robinson

Respondent

Amareece Shelton

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • HearingEvent: Early Resolution Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketERC - Early Resolution Management Conference (docket date:10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:10/13/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketAFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children (docket date:10/12/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketPWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support (docket date:10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:10/12/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/6/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less