This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 09/04/2020 at 09:29:49 (UTC).

Darren A Wedner VS Danielle K Brown

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 Darren A Wedner filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Danielle K Brown. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is LeMaire, Kerstin. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0008

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

LeMaire, Kerstin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Darren A Wedner

Respondent

Danielle K Brown

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Intervenor

Steven Wade Keidel

Not Classified By Court

James P Mueller

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Frances McGinnis

Intervenor Attorney

Spencer Schiefer

Not Classified By Court Attorney

James Mueller

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • Docket084 - ME: Case Continued Inactive Calendar (docket date:5/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • HearingEvent: Status Conference; Result: Minute Entry Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • Docket028 - ME: Status Conference Set (docket date:5/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • HearingEvent: Status Conference; Result: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docket078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar (docket date:4/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketEXW - Exhibits Work Sheet (docket date:4/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docket078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar (docket date:3/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • HearingEvent: Temporary Orders; Result: Trial/Evh Held-Petition Concluded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: PRETRIAL STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketSTA - Statement (docket date:3/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:1/3/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketNOTE: FOR SOLE LEGAL DECISION-MAKING TO PARTY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:1/3/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketNOTE: PRE-DECREE/WITHOUT NOTICE FOR LEGAL DECISION MKAING AND PHYSICAL CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketPTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS (docket date:1/3/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:1/3/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:1/3/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:1/3/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:1/3/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:1/3/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less