This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/17/2020 at 19:05:31 (UTC).

Danielle Christine Parker VS Kevin Andrew Cain

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 Danielle Christine Parker filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Kevin Andrew Cain. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Marwil, Suzanne. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4681

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Marwil, Suzanne

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Danielle Christine Parker

Respondent

Kevin Andrew Cain

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • HearingEvent: Decree on Demand - Regular; Result: Decree Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketDFS - Default Decree (docket date:12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • HearingEvent: Decree on Demand - Regular; Result: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • HearingEvent: Decree on Demand - Regular; Result: Vacated & Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketNIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case (docket date:11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/27/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:10/2/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:9/9/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:7/22/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:7/22/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:7/22/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:7/22/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:7/22/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less