This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 01/22/2013 at 05:59:55 (UTC).

Daniel Sadowsky Et Al VS Jimmie Fortenberry

Case Summary

On 10/23/2012 Daniel Sadowsky filed an Other lawsuit against Jimmie Fortenberry. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Willett, Eileen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1070

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Willett, Eileen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Daniel Sadowsky

Bryson Andrew Allen

Defendant

Jimmie Fortenberry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Steven Clark

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/15/2013

Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:1/15/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2013

DocketANS - Answer (docket date:1/7/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2013

DocketNOTE: Defendant's Answer / eFile Billing $223

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2013

DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:1/7/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2013

DocketNOTE: Notice of Appearance

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2012

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:12/20/2012) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2012

DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:12/21/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2012

DocketNOTE: JIMMIE FORTENBERRY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2012

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:10/24/2012) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2012

DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:10/24/2012) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2012

DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:10/24/2012) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less