This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/19/2020 at 09:24:41 (UTC).

Daniel E Rodas VS Amy Rodas

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Daniel E Rodas filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Amy Rodas. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Astrowsky, Brad. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5658

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Astrowsky, Brad

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Daniel E Rodas

Respondent

Amy Rodas

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: Decree on Demand - Regular

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Parent Education Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2020
  • DocketPEC - Parent Education Certificate (docket date:11/4/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:10/22/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:9/29/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less