This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/27/2021 at 23:03:48 (UTC).

Danelle Lendsey Et Al VS Jayken Beal

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Danelle Lendsey filed an Other lawsuit against Jayken Beal. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5197

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Danelle Lendsey

Stephen Lendsey

Defendant

Jayken Beal

In Re

Saif Woods

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

C Brown

Defendant Attorney

David Amundsen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Arbitration Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNOH - Notice Of Hearing (docket date:2/4/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Report of Early Meeting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketREP - Report (docket date:1/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator (docket date:12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Jury Demand

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Answer / EFILE BILLING $245.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNOTE: JAYKEN BEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less