Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/29/2016 at 11:52:09 (UTC).

D R H Southwest Construction Inc Et Al VS Rudolfo Bros Plastering Inc Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2014 D R H Southwest Construction Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Rudolfo Bros Plastering Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Gass, David. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5011

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Gass, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

D R H Southwest Construction Inc

D R Horton Inc-Dietz-Crane

Defendants

Rudolfo Bros Plastering Inc

Michael Rudolfo

Noelia Rudolfo

Pasqual Rudolfo

Christine Rudolfo

Rudolfo Bros L L C

Rudolfo Bros Masonry L L C

Rudlofo Bros Investments L L C

Sombrero Construction L L C

Vision West Custom Builders L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James O'Brien

Defendant Attorneys

Jared Scarbrough

April Hancock

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2015
  • ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:11/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • NOTE: ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS RUDOLFO BROS. PLASTERING, INC., RUDOLFO BROS. MASONRY, L.L.C., MICHAEL RUDOLFO, NOELIA RUDOLFO, PASQUAL RUDOLFO, AND CHRISTINE RUDOLFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:11/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • NOTE: Notice of Change of Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:11/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • NOTE: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF RUDOLFO BROS. PLASTERING, INC., RUDOLFO BROS. MASONRY, L.L.C., MICHAEL RUDOLFO, NOELIA RUDOLFO, PASQUAL RUDOLFO, AND CHRISTINE RUDOLFO WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • REQ - Request (docket date:11/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • NOTE: JOINT REQUEST TO VACATE THE COURTS AUGUST 6, 2015 DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF RUDOLFO BROS. PLASTERING, INC., RUDOLFO BROS. MASONRY, L.L.C., MICHAEL RUDOLFO, NOELIA RUDOLFO, PASQUAL RUDOLFO, AND CHRISTINE RUDOLFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • 079 - ME: Case Dismissed - Partial (docket date:8/6/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • 066 - ME: Case Reassigned (docket date:7/2/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2014
  • CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration (docket date:4/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • NOTE: Defendant RCR Properties, L.L.C. Certificate for Compulsory Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • ANS - Answer (docket date:4/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • NOTE: Defendant RCR Properties, L.L.C. Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint / efile billing $222

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • AMC - Amended Complaint (docket date:3/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • NOTE: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: (1) Express Indemnity (2) Breach of Contract (3) Breach of Implied Warranty of Workmanship and Habitability (4) Negligence (5) Common Law/Implied Indemnity (6) Breach of Contract Insurance Requirements (7) Declaratory Relief Regarding the Separate Duties to Defend and Indemnify (8) Contribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:2/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:2/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:2/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:2/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less