This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/18/2016 at 21:24:33 (UTC).

D L Withers Lc VS Commercial Horizon Framing Company Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2001 D L Withers Lc filed an Other lawsuit against Commercial Horizon Framing Company. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Civil Court Admin, Judge. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9428

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Civil Court Admin, Judge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D L Withers Lc

Defendants

Commercial Horizon Framing Company

All America Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dennis Garrey

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/08/2002

323 - ME: Jdgmnt Dismissal - Lack Srv (docket date:5/8/2002)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2002

311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:4/16/2002)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/20/2002

322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss (docket date:2/20/2002)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2001

COM - Complaint (docket date:11/16/2001) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2001

CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:11/16/2001) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2001

NOT - Notice (docket date:11/16/2001) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2001

NOTE: SEPARATE DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less