This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 12:08:09 (UTC).

Crescent Bank & Trust VS Lorraine D Moreno Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/22/2009 Crescent Bank Trust filed an Other lawsuit against Lorraine D Moreno. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Civil Court Adm 01, Calendar. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4248

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Civil Court Adm 01, Calendar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crescent Bank & Trust

Defendants

Lorraine D Moreno

Rudy V Moreno

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan Levinsky

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/14/2011

ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond (docket date:2/18/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2011

NDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:2/3/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2011

NOTE: EX PARTE/ WITHOUT PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2011

PTT - Petition (docket date:2/2/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2011

NOTE: EXONERATING BOND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2010

047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal (docket date:10/6/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2010

078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar (docket date:7/28/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2009

NOT - Notice (docket date:12/11/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2009

NOTE: OF ISSUANCE OF PROVISIONAL REMEDY WITHOUT PRIOR NOTICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2009

NOT - Notice (docket date:12/11/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
12/09/2009

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:12/21/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2009

NOTE: LORRAINE D MORENO SERVED 11/24/09

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2009

BON - Bond (docket date:11/25/2009) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2009

NOTE: $9,200.00/ WINDSOR CREDIT SERVICE/ HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2009

ORD - Order (docket date:11/10/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2009

NOTE: TAKING PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2009

COM - Complaint (docket date:10/26/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2009

CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:10/26/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2009

AFF - Affidavit (docket date:10/26/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2009

NOTE: OF PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF ORDER FOR PROVISIONAL REMEDY WITHOUT NOTICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less