This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 01/14/2019 at 07:29:56 (UTC).

Credit Acceptance Corp VS Lee H Nez

Case Summary

On 03/05/2018 Credit Acceptance Corp filed an Other lawsuit against Lee H Nez. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3176

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Credit Acceptance Corp

Defendant

Lee H Nez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Leroy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/05/2018

323 - ME: Jdgmnt Dismissal - Lack Srv (docket date:9/5/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2018

322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss (docket date:5/9/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2018

COM - Complaint (docket date:3/5/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2018

CSH - Coversheet (docket date:3/5/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2018

CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:3/5/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less