This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/20/2020 at 09:32:29 (UTC).

Cornelius Gillespie VS Deseree Hudson

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Cornelius Gillespie filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Deseree Hudson. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Brain, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5684

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Brain, Mark

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cornelius Gillespie

Respondent

Deseree Hudson

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Not Classified By Court

Audrey Davison

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • HearingEvent: Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:11/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket230 ME: Appointment of Child Representative (docket date:10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket028 - ME: Status Conference Set (docket date:10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Temporary Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • HearingEvent: Temporary Orders; Result: Minute Entry Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: RE TEMPORARY ORDERS WITH NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketORA - Order To Appear (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:9/23/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: FOR SOLE LEGAL DECISION-MAKING TO PARTY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:9/23/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: PRE-DECREE/WITHOUT NOTICE FOR LEGAL DECISION MAKING AND PHYSICAL CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS (docket date:9/23/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/23/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/23/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less