Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 09:04:51 (UTC).

Coppercrest Leveraged Mortgage Fund L L C VS Christy Elftmann Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/21/2009 Coppercrest Leveraged Mortgage Fund L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Christy Elftmann. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2584

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Coppercrest Leveraged Mortgage Fund L L C

Defendants

Christy Elftmann

Judith Ann Cannon

Wendy Lee Elftmann

Arthur J Elftmann

Candice Lynn Elftmann

Lance Parker Elftmann

Arthur Joseph Elftmann

George L Cannon

Eagle Mountain R V Park Inc

Assignee

Guaranty Solutions L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Knapper

Defendant Attorney

John Dillingham

Assignee Attorney

Dustin Horne

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2014
  • ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment (docket date:8/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • NOTE: RENEWAL AFFIDAVIT OF JUDGMENT AGAINST EAGLE MOUNTAIN RV PARK, INC., LANCE PARKER ELFTMANN AKA LANCE P. ELFTMANN, CHRISTY ELFTMANN AKA CHRISY LYNN MCDERMOTT, ARTHUR JOSEPH ELFTMANN JR., CANDICE LYNN ELFTMANN AKA CANDY ELFTMANN, AND ARTHUR J. ELFTMANN, SR./Efile billing $27.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2014
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:8/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2014
  • NOTE: Assignment of Judgment AGAINST EAGLE MOUNTAIN RV PARK, INC., LANCE PARKER ELFTMANN AKA LANCE P. ELFTMANN, CHRISTY ELFTMANN AKA CHRISY LYNN MCDERMOTT, ARTHUR JOSEPH ELFTMANN JR., CANDICE LYNN ELFTMANN AKA CANDY ELFTMANN, ARTHUR J. ELFTMANN, SR. AND WENDY LEE ELFTMANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:3/20/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • NOTE: Assignment of Judgment against Eagle Mountain RV Park Inc, Lance Parker Elftmann aka Lance P Elftmann, Christy Elftmann aka Chrisy Lynn McDermott, Arthur Joseph Elftmann Jr, Candice Lynn Elftmann aka Candy Elftmann, Arthur J Elftmann Sr, and Wendy Lee Elftmann/Paid $301.00 Receipt # 22040863

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:12/9/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2010
  • SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment (docket date:12/6/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2010
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:11/16/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • PTT - Petition (docket date:10/29/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2009
  • NOTE: JUDITH ANN CANNON SERVED 05/24/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:6/4/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:6/4/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:6/4/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:6/4/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:6/4/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:6/4/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:6/4/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:5/26/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:5/26/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less