This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/18/2016 at 10:20:33 (UTC).

Cmi L L C VS Southwest Vending Inc

Case Summary

On 08/13/2001 Cmi L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Southwest Vending Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Civil Court Admin, Judge. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4036

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Civil Court Admin, Judge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cmi L L C

Defendant

Southwest Vending Inc

Other

Arbitrator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ann Bruzzese

Defendant Attorney

Kent Berk

Other Attorney

KAREN MCDONALD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/28/2002

LET - Letter (docket date:3/19/2002)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2002

ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:2/7/2002) (filing party: Defendant(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2002

NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2001

SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:12/18/2001) (filing party: Defendant(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2001

NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2001

324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator (docket date:10/19/2001)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2001

ANS - Answer (docket date:10/3/2001) (filing party: Defendant(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2001

CAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration (docket date:10/19/2001) (filing party: Defendant(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2001

AFD - Affidavit On Default (docket date:9/28/2001) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2001

ADE - Application For Default (docket date:9/28/2001) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2001

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:8/22/2001) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2001

NOTE: P2 SERVED 8-16-2001

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2001

SUM - Summons (docket date:8/28/2001) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2001

COM - Complaint (docket date:8/16/2001) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2001

CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:8/16/2001) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less