This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:00:33 (UTC).

Claudia Rodriguez VS Clifford Paul Ackerman

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Claudia Rodriguez filed an Other lawsuit against Clifford Paul Ackerman. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1713

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Claudia Rodriguez

Defendant

Clifford Paul Ackerman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNOTE: CLIFFORD PAUL ACKERMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:1/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less