This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/30/2016 at 10:15:23 (UTC).

City Of Phoenix VS Redwood Place L L C

Case Summary

On 03/10/2015 City Of Phoenix filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Redwood Place L L C. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitten, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0591

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Whitten, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City Of Phoenix

Defendant

Redwood Place L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STANLEY HAMMERMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2016
  • SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment (docket date:6/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • NOTE: Satisfaction of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • JUD - Judgment (docket date:9/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear (docket date:8/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • NOTE: Motion and Sum Certain Affidavit for Entry of Judgment by Default without Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • SOC - Statement Of Costs (docket date:8/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • NOTE: Statement of Costs and Notice of Taxation of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:8/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:5/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:5/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • NOTE: Application and Affidavit for Entry of Default and Notice of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:3/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • NOTE: REDWOOD PLACE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:3/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:3/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less