This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/15/2016 at 17:39:58 (UTC).

City Of Mesa VS Maricopa County Superior Court Collection Unit/ Jury Fees Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2009 City Of Mesa filed an Other lawsuit against Maricopa County Superior Court Collection Unit/ Jury Fees. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Oberbillig, Robert. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3263

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Oberbillig, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City Of Mesa

Defendants

Maricopa County Superior Court Collection Unit/ Jury Fees

Maricopa County

Clerk Of The Board Of Supervisors

Smi-Eloan

Jason Cotton

Elizabeth I Thomas

Cach L L C

Max Default Services Corporation

E-Loan Inc

Jon F Thomas

Provident Funding Associates L P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Fritz

Defendant Attorney

Brad Keogh

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2015
  • NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit (docket date:3/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • NOTE: $1525.00/CITY OF MESA/Notice of Release of Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court (docket date:3/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • NOTE: $1525.00 / STALE DATED CHECKS / CITY OF MESA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit (docket date:8/6/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • NOTE: Notice of Release of Deposit With the Court / CITY OF MESA $1525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • 019 - ME: Ruling (docket date:8/5/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:7/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • NOTE: Motion to Release Previously Deposited Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • OOC - Order Of Condemnations (docket date:4/19/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/27/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • NOTE: E-LOAN INC 10/09/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/28/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • NOTE: PROVIDENT FUNDING ASSOCIATES LP SERVED 10/9/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • OSC - Order To Show Cause (docket date:10/9/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • NOTE: RE IMMEDIATE POSSESSION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2009
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2009
  • APL - Application (docket date:9/23/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2009
  • NOTE: FOR ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO TAKE IMMEDIATE POSSESSION OF AND TOUSE PROPERTY SOUGHT TO BE ACQUIRED FOR PUBLIC SCHOOLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2009
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/23/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less