This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/15/2016 at 13:34:19 (UTC).

City Of Chandler VS Ulrike Maria Braun Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2009 City Of Chandler filed an Other lawsuit against Ulrike Maria Braun. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Talamante, David. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1054

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Talamante, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City Of Chandler

Defendants

Ulrike Maria Braun

Consolidated Blimpie Of Arizona Inc

Holiday Hills Country Club Inc

Maria Nicole Barkovics

Heights Properties

Circle K Stores Inc

Ronald W Lawton

Alan Biscotti

Washington National Insurance Company

National Bank Of Arizona

Imre Laszlo Barkovics

Mobil Oil Corporation

San Marcos Square Owners Association

Maricopa County

Hans J Braun

Genevieve Biscotti

Walgreen Arizona Drug Company

Wells Fargo Bank

Elizabeth Lawton

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Glenn Brockman

Defendant Attorneys

Martin Aronson

Mary Cronin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2014
  • OOC - Order Of Condemnations (docket date:9/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • NOTE: FINAL Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:8/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • NOTE: Notice of Lodging Final Order of Condemnation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment (docket date:8/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • NOTE: Acknowledgement of Receipt and Satisfaction of Judgment in Condemnation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment (docket date:8/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • NOTE: Acknowledgement of Receipt and Satisfaction of Judgment in Condemnation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment (docket date:8/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • NOTE: Acknowledgement of Receipt and Satisfaction of Judgment in Condemnation

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:6/23/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:6/25/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2009
  • NOTE: CONSOLIDATEDF BLIMPIE OF ARIZONA INC 6-12-2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2009
  • OSC - Order To Show Cause (docket date:6/15/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2009
  • NOTE: RE: APPLICATION FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • 056 - ME: Hearing Set (docket date:6/4/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2009
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:5/28/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2009
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:5/28/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2009
  • APL - Application (docket date:5/28/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2009
  • NOTE: FOR ORDER OF IMMEDIATE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less