Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/30/2016 at 08:05:19 (UTC).

Citibank N A Et Al VS Cal State Investment Limited Partnership Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2014 Citibank N A filed an Other lawsuit against Cal State Investment Limited Partnership. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Morrow, James. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1840

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Morrow, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Citibank N A

Hudson Americas L L C

Defendants

Cal State Investment Limited Partnership

Bill Layton

Karen Dotras

Firestone Apartments L L C

Viken Ohanesian

J W Hunt R E, I R A, L L C

Erik Velastegui

Jill Velastegui

Mark Fenton

Lorna Fenton

Eugene Vollucci

Robert Lynch

Hilde Lynch

John Hunt

Donna Hunt

Lynch Living Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amelia Valenzuela

Defendant Attorney

Richard Groves

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2015
  • ACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:9/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • NOTE: Acceptance of Service LYNCH DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • ORD - Order (docket date:7/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • NOTE: ORDER QUASHING ORDER CHARGING THE INTEREST OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR IN RIDGECREST HOLDINGS LLC WITH PAYMENT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • 022 - ME: Order Signed (docket date:7/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • ORD - Order (docket date:7/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • NOTE: QUASHING ORDER CHARGING THE INTERST OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR IN RIDGECRES HOLDINGS L L C WITH PAYMENT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • MTQ - Motion To Quash (docket date:7/8/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • NOTE: Motion to Quash Order Charging the Interest of Judgment Debtor in Ridgecrest Holdings LLC With Payment of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:6/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2014
  • NOTE: Motion for Entry of Order Requiring Judgment Debtor Robert Lynch to Appear and to Produce Documents / EFILE BILLING $27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • MJA - Mot/Ord Req Jud/Dbtr To Appear (docket date:10/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • NOTE: Motion for Entry of Order Requiring Judgment Debtor Hilde Lynch to Appear and to Produce Documents/EFILE BILLING $27.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail (docket date:9/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • NOTE: Affidavit of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:9/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • NFJ - Notice of Filing Foreign Judgment (docket date:9/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • JUD - Judgment (docket date:9/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less