This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:02:24 (UTC).

Cia Spyres VS Steven A Daniels L L C

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Cia Spyres filed an Other lawsuit against Steven A Daniels L L C. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Garbarino, David and Martin, Daniel. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1736

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Garbarino, David

Martin, Daniel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cia Spyres

Defendant

Steven A Daniels L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Stephen Brower

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • Docket053 - ME: Case Consolidation (docket date:10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNOTE: STEVEN A DANIELS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNOTE: STEVEN A DANIELS L L C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketNOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketREL - Reply (docket date:10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketNOTE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND THE MOTION TO EXPEDITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketRES - Response (docket date:10/9/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Motion to Consolidate

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNOTE: STEVEN A DANIELS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/9/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNOTE: STEVEN A DANIELS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/9/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNOTE: STEVEN A DANIELS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/9/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less