This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 09:49:49 (UTC).

Christopher Renner VS Alyssa Renner

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 Christopher Renner filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Alyssa Renner. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Kiefer, Joseph. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0722

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Northwest Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Kiefer, Joseph

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Christopher Renner

Respondents

Alyssa Renner

Alyssa Naomi Trahan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/20/2020

HearingEvent: Decree on Demand - Regular; Result: Decree Signed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2020

JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2020

DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2020

DocketDFS - Default Decree (docket date:8/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2020

DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:7/1/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2020

DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:6/8/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2020

DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:6/8/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2020

DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:6/8/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2020

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:6/8/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2020

DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:6/8/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2020

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:6/8/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less