This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 01/30/2020 at 09:19:08 (UTC).

Christopher Rene Silva, Robert M Acuna Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2019 Christopher Rene Silva, Robert M Acuna was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is McGuire, J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1346

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Northwest Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

McGuire, J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Robert M Acuna

Guardian Ad Litem

Christopher Rene Silva

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/24/2019

Docket433 - Decree Of Adoption (docket date:9/24/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2019

DocketDEA - Decree of Adoption (docket date:9/30/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2019

DocketNOTE: VITAL RECORDS CERTIFICATE OF ADOPTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2019

DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:9/30/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2019

DocketIRE - Investigative Report (docket date:9/24/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2019

DocketNOTE: RICARDO G RAMOS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2019

DocketCTA - Consent To Adopt (docket date:8/7/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2019

DocketNOTE: ROSARIO ACUNA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2019

DocketCTA - Consent To Adopt (docket date:8/7/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2019

DocketPIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access (docket date:8/7/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2019

DocketPFA - Approval Of Adoption Agreement (docket date:8/7/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less