This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/21/2020 at 09:39:56 (UTC).

Christopher Iglesias VS Kelly Walker

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Christopher Iglesias filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Kelly Walker. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Astrowsky, Brad. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5688

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Astrowsky, Brad

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Christopher Iglesias

Respondent

Kelly Walker

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

David Goldfarb

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • HearingEvent: Resolution Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Amended Notice of Petitioners Request for UCCJEA Conference Pursuant to ARS 25-1036(B)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Petitioners Request for a UCCJEA Conference Pursuant to ARS 25-1036(B)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNOTE: FOR RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketORA - Order To Appear (docket date:11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • HearingEvent: Resolution Management Conference; Result: Vacate (Lack of Service)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Motion for Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2020
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Accelerated Motion for Temporary Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketPTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS (docket date:10/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less