This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/02/2016 at 08:07:26 (UTC).

Christopher Holly VS Macera Enterprises Inc

Case Summary

On 06/21/2000 Christopher Holly filed an Other lawsuit against Macera Enterprises Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Talamante, David. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1780

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Talamante, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Holly

Defendant

Macera Enterprises Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hal Mack

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/29/2001

047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal (docket date:8/29/2001)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2000

311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:11/28/2000)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2000

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:8/2/2000)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2000

NOTE: SERVED P2 7-28-00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2000

AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:7/31/2000)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2000

COM - Complaint (docket date:6/22/2000) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2000

CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:6/22/2000) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less