Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 22:40:23 (UTC).

Christine J Correa Et Al VS Joel Robert Pippett Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2007 Christine J Correa filed an Other lawsuit against Joel Robert Pippett. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Brnovich, Susan. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1001

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2007

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Brnovich, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Christine J Correa

Lauramae Anderson

Leonard Anderson

June Anderson

Matthew Anderson

Richard Correa

Defendants

Joel Robert Pippett

Riptide Properties L L C

Walter Woodard

Coebilt Homes L L C

Coebilt Inc

West U S A Realty Inc

Chad G Cloward

Quest Real Estate L L C

Quest Holdings L L C

Michelle Woodard

Gregory P Coe

Others

Wells Fargo Bank N A

Jpmorgan Chase Bank N A

Arizona Federal Credit Union

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Lonn

Defendant Attorneys

Neal Thomas

John Jones

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2014
  • RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail (docket date:3/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail (docket date:3/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail (docket date:2/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:2/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • SOC - Statement Of Costs (docket date:1/8/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • NOTE: Statement of Costs and Notice of Taxation of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment (docket date:1/8/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • NOTE: Affidavit for Renewal of Judgment-EFILE BILLING $27.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • JUD - Judgment (docket date:9/4/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
233 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2007
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:3/28/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2007
  • NOTE: SERVED QUEST HOLDINGS LLC DBA QUEST INVESTMENT REAL ESTATE ON 03/22/07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2007
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:3/28/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2007
  • NOTE: SERVED QUEST REAL ESTATE LLC ON 03/22/07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2007
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:3/28/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2007
  • NOTE: SERVED COEBILT HOMES LLC ON 03/22/07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2007
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:3/16/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2007
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:3/16/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2007
  • CER - Certificate (docket date:3/16/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2007
  • NOTE: CERTIFICATION REGARDING NEED FOR EXPERT TESTIMONY

    Read MoreRead Less