This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 10/16/2020 at 02:31:56 (UTC).

Christian Jones VS Debra Norton

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Christian Jones filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Debra Norton. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponce, Adele. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6853

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ponce, Adele

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Christian Jones

Respondent

Debra Norton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Lyndsey Fibus

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: Resolution Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • HearingEvent: Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • Docket700 - ME: Resolution Management Conference Set (docket date:10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • Docket028 - ME: Status Conference Set (docket date:10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:10/6/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Response to Petition for Legal Separation WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN and Cross Petition for Dissolution of Marriage PD 274 R# 27973686

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:10/6/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE: EXPEDITED / FOR EXCLUSIVE USE OF THE MARTIAL RESIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:9/30/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less