This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/04/2016 at 02:48:58 (UTC).

Chris Dean Wiens Et Al VS Homebuyer Group L L C Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2010 Chris Dean Wiens filed an Other lawsuit against Homebuyer Group L L C. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Udall, David. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6754

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Udall, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chris Dean Wiens

Wiens Construction Inc

Belinda Gail Wiens

Defendants

Homebuyer Group L L C

Barry Lee Luchtel

Luchtel Investments L L C

Luchtel Organization

Kayak Fund L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas Burnett

Defendant Attorneys

Johnny Sorenson

Brendan O'Connell

Michael Pruitt

M Murdy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2013
  • 047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal (docket date:9/11/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • 078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar (docket date:7/10/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • NOS - Notice Of Settlement (docket date:7/1/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • NOTE: Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • RES - Response (docket date:6/28/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • NOTE: Notice of Joinder in Defendant Homebuyer Group's Response to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • RES - Response (docket date:6/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • NOTE: Defendant Barry Lee Luchtel's Response to Plaintiffs' Motions In Limine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:6/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • NOTE: Stipulation to Dismiss Cross-Claims Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
215 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2011
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:4/20/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • NOTE: HOMEBUYER GROUP LLC 04/06/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2011
  • 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:2/2/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service (docket date:1/10/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • NOTE: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE UNTIL 04/10/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:12/20/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • NOTE: Motion to Extend Time for Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • 322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss (docket date:12/8/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:9/2/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/2/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less