This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 18:56:07 (UTC).

Cherylann Lugo VS Victor J Lugo

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Cherylann Lugo filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Victor J Lugo. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Blanchard, John. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6887

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Blanchard, John

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cherylann Lugo

Respondent

Victor J Lugo

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNOTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketIWO Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access (docket date:2/9/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCDS - Consent Decree (docket date:2/9/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNOTE: JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:2/8/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketPWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support (docket date:2/8/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketOCS - Order For Child Support (docket date:2/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case (docket date:1/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less