This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 01/24/2021 at 02:54:05 (UTC).

Cheryl Annette Miller VS Ralph Edward Miller

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Cheryl Annette Miller filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Ralph Edward Miller. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Marwil, Suzanne. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6857

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Marwil, Suzanne

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cheryl Annette Miller

Respondent

Ralph Edward Miller

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case (docket date:1/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNOTE: CERTIFICATE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less