This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 20:32:38 (UTC).

Cesar Y Alvarado VS Sandra Samaniego

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Cesar Y Alvarado filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Sandra Samaniego. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Ash, Lori and Covil, Max. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5685

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Ash, Lori

Covil, Max

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Cesar Y Alvarado

Cesar Alvarado

Respondent

Sandra Samaniego

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Michael Hurley

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:2/1/2021) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case (docket date:1/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNOTE: CONSENT DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNOL - Notice of Lodging (docket date:1/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Parent Education Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketPEC - Parent Education Certificate (docket date:11/9/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNOTE: TO CORRECT PETITIONERS NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Acceptance of Service and Waiver of service by process

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketRFN - Request To Restore Former Name (docket date:10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Parent Education Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketPEC - Parent Education Certificate (docket date:10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less