This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 16:53:00 (UTC).

Cavalry S P V, I, L L C VS Drake L Oddy

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Cavalry S P V, I, L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Drake L Oddy. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1678

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry S P V, I, L L C

Defendant

Drake L Oddy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Whitney Jacobson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Motion for Leave for Alternative or Substitute Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:1/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less