This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 18:56:39 (UTC).

Catherine M Peterson VS Scott W Peterson

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Catherine M Peterson filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Scott W Peterson. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Blanchard, John. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6895

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Blanchard, John

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Catherine M Peterson

Respondent

Scott W Peterson

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jon McAvoy

Respondent Attorney

Stuart Peterson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • HearingEvent: Resolution Management Conference; Result: Vacated & Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docket020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement (docket date:2/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Temporary Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:2/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • HearingEvent: Temporary Orders; Result: Trial/Evh Held-Petition Concluded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • HearingEvent: Temporary Orders; Result: Vacated & Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Respondents RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND SEPARATE PRETRIAL STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketSTA - Statement (docket date:2/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Petitioners Separate Pre Hearing Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketSTA - Statement (docket date:2/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Application and Affidavit for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less