This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 02:32:10 (UTC).

Carmen Gonzalez Moreno VS Vicente Jacobo Moreno

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Carmen Gonzalez Moreno filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Vicente Jacobo Moreno. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Coffey, Rodrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6856

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Coffey, Rodrick

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Carmen Gonzalez Moreno

Respondent

Vicente Jacobo Moreno

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:10/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less