This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/17/2021 at 20:09:12 (UTC).

Carlena Marie Krick-Lawson VS Apollo Security Group Inc Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Carlena Marie Krick-Lawson filed an Other lawsuit against Apollo Security Group Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5236

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carlena Marie Krick-Lawson

Defendants

Apollo Security Group Inc

Craig Michael Sims

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Gulbrandsen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less