This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/18/2020 at 11:43:40 (UTC).

Cale Winton Aylsworth VS Brandy Parmenter

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Cale Winton Aylsworth filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Brandy Parmenter. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponce, Adele. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6893

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ponce, Adele

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cale Winton Aylsworth

Respondent

Brandy Parmenter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Amber Guymon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Acceptance of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Parent Education Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketPEC - Parent Education Certificate (docket date:10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketAMC - Amended Complaint (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less