This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/27/2021 at 06:49:40 (UTC).

C A G Acceptance L L C VS Bradley Matthew Bretoi Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 C A G Acceptance L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Bradley Matthew Bretoi. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1684

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

C A G Acceptance L L C

Defendants

Bradley Matthew Bretoi

Roseanna Marie Bretoi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sanford Germaine

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketAWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment (docket date:2/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:2/9/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Application for Entry of Default and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:2/5/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: C A G Acceptance L L C Judgment Against: Roseanna Marie Bretoi, Amount: $10,329.87, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: C A G Acceptance L L C Judgment Against: Roseanna Marie Bretoi, Amount: $1,050.36, Frequency: One Time, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: C A G Acceptance L L C Judgment Against: Roseanna Marie Bretoi, Amount: $2,845.00, Frequency: One Time, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: C A G Acceptance L L C Judgment Against: Roseanna Marie Bretoi, Amount: $741.35, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketDFJ - Default Judgment (docket date:1/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Motion to Extend Time for Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketMXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:12/8/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:12/8/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Application for Entry of Default and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:12/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: BRADLEY MATTHEW BRETOI AND ROSEANNA MARIE BRETOI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less