This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/06/2016 at 23:17:03 (UTC).

Buckeye Check Cashing Of Arizona Inc VS Annie Barragan Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2009 Buckeye Check Cashing Of Arizona Inc filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Annie Barragan. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Morrow, James. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2523

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2009

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Morrow, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Buckeye Check Cashing Of Arizona Inc

Defendants

Annie Barragan

Marcelo Barragan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Hameroff

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/22/2010

ORD - Order (docket date:3/30/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2010

NOTE: RELEASING GARNISHMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2010

PTT - Petition (docket date:3/19/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2010

NOTE: FOR RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2010

SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment (docket date:3/15/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2009

OCL - Order Of Continuing Lien (docket date:11/19/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2009

APL - Application (docket date:10/21/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2009

NOTE: FOR ORDER OF CONTINUING LIEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2009

NOT - Notice (docket date:10/2/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2009

NOTE: OF COMPLIANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2009

AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment (docket date:9/14/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2009

DJU - Default Judgment (docket date:8/14/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2009

NOTE: CERTIFIED COPY FROM MARYVALE JC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less