This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 16:52:12 (UTC).

Buck A Z Communications L L C VS Zummit Plastics Inc

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Buck A Z Communications L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Zummit Plastics Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1666

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Buck A Z Communications L L C

Defendant

Zummit Plastics Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kyle Hallstrom

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin Nielsen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNOTE: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:2/4/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Joint Stipulation for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:2/3/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Answer / EFILE BILLING $245.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:10/6/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less