This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 18:56:11 (UTC).

Brandon Hill VS Markita Arnett

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Brandon Hill filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Markita Arnett. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Coffey, Rodrick. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6888

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Coffey, Rodrick

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Brandon Hill

Respondent

Markita Arnett

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNOTE: FOR MORE TIME TO SERVE THE OTHER PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:1/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketMXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:1/22/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service (docket date:11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: TO SERVE BY / PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:10/5/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less