This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/22/2021 at 15:42:05 (UTC).

Brandi Lee Jordan VS James Eric Jordan

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 Brandi Lee Jordan filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against James Eric Jordan. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Julian, Melissa. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1974

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Julian, Melissa

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Brandi Lee Jordan

Respondent

James Eric Jordan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/01/2020

DocketNIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case (docket date:12/1/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2020

DocketNOTE: FAMILY COURT Acceptance of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2020

DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:8/5/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2020

DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:8/3/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2020

DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:8/3/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2020

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:8/3/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2020

DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:8/3/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2020

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:8/3/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less