This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 04/02/2021 at 06:09:44 (UTC).

Beverly J Connors, Patrick A Connors Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 Beverly J Connors, Patrick A Connors was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is McGuire, J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1268

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Northwest Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

McGuire, J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Beverly J Connors

Decedent

Patrick A Connors

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Catherine Egan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/23/2020

DocketAPU - Affidavit Of Publication (docket date:11/30/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2020

DocketNOTE: OF FILING RECORDED LETTERS OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2020

DocketPRO - Proof (docket date:11/16/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2020

DocketNOTE: APPLICATION FOR INFORMAL APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE / ACCEPTANCE OF APPOINTMENT AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE / STATEMENT OF INFORMAL APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2020

DocketPNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing (docket date:11/16/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2020

DocketNOTE: NOTICE OF INFORMAL APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2020

DocketPNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing (docket date:11/16/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2020

DocketNOTE: NOTICE TO CREDITORS AND BENEFICIARIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2020

DocketPNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing (docket date:11/16/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2020

DocketNOTE: ORDER TO PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND INFORMATION TO HEIRS AND DEVISEES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
10/23/2020

DocketNOTE: BEVERLY CONNORS / PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020

DocketDCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion (docket date:10/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020

DocketNIP - Notice Of Informal Probate (docket date:10/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020

DocketNOTE: TO CREDITORS AND BENEFICIARIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020

DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:10/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020

DocketSIP - Statement Of Informal Probate (docket date:10/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2020

DocketWIL - Will (docket date:10/26/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2020

DocketPIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access (docket date:10/22/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2020

DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:10/22/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2020

DocketAPE - Application/Petition (docket date:10/22/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less