This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/26/2021 at 06:35:58 (UTC).

Betty R Craig-Bolze VS Hui Cheng Mei Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Betty R Craig-Bolze filed an Other lawsuit against Hui Cheng Mei. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1738

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Betty R Craig-Bolze

Defendants

Jennifer Diane Reed

Hui Cheng Mei

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura Bramnick

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNOTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketRNM - Returned Mail (docket date:1/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Answer / EFILE BILLING $245

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:12/11/2020) (filing party: Defendant(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:12/8/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Application for Entry of Default against Defendant Hui Cheng Mei

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Application for Entry of Default against Defendant Jennifer Diane Reed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNOTE: HUI CHENG MEI

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less