This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/17/2020 at 07:34:01 (UTC).

Bart Broviak VS Lola Maksimova-Broviak

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Bart Broviak filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Lola Maksimova-Broviak. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is VandenBerg, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1298

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northwest Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

VandenBerg, Lisa

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bart Broviak

Respondent

Lola Maksimova-Broviak

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Tejay Coon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Withdrawal OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney (docket date:10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketDFS - Default Decree (docket date:10/7/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketNOTE: Motion and Affidavit for Entry of Default Without Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketMAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution (docket date:9/9/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:8/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Filing Affidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:7/1/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:7/1/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:7/1/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:7/1/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:7/1/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:7/1/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less