This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:03:26 (UTC).

Bank Of The West VS Jason W Wingate Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Bank Of The West filed an Other lawsuit against Jason W Wingate. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Warner, Randall. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1750

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Warner, Randall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of The West

Defendants

Meaghan Wingate

Jason W Wingate

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Sinodis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/ WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:12/4/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:11/6/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice and Application for Entry of Default; Affidavit of John G. Sinodis IN SUPORT THEREOF; and Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: PURSUANT TO ARS 12-2405

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: PURSUANT TO ARS 12-2406

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: JASON WINGATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: MEAGHAN WINGATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: OF APRIL CURTIS IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF PROVISIONAL REMEDY WITH NOTICE REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAFF - Affidavit (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAPR - Application/Issuance/Provisional Remedies (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less