This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/03/2016 at 13:52:55 (UTC).

Aurora Munoz De Munoz Et Al VS Valley Metro Rail Inc Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2010 Aurora Munoz De Munoz filed an Other lawsuit against Valley Metro Rail Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is LeMaire, Kerstin. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0335

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

LeMaire, Kerstin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Aurora Munoz De Munoz

Pablo Luis Munoz

Defendants

Valley Metro Rail Inc

U R S Corporation Group Consultants

Parsons Brinckerhoff Consult Inc

P B Americas Inc

U R S Corporation

H D R Engineering Inc

Post Buckley Schuh & Jernigan Inc

Michael Baker Jr Inc

O T A K Inc

Parsons Brinckerhoff Group Administration Inc

City Of Mesa

Archer Western Contractors Ltd

Other

Gannett Fleming Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Terry Fong

Defendant Attorneys

Lori Berke

Ian Neale

James Kloss

Jodi Skeel

Kelly Wilkins

C Campbell

Shanks Leonhardt

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2011
  • 022 - ME: Order Signed (docket date:8/22/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:8/24/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2011
  • ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:7/7/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2011
  • NOTE: ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:6/22/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • NOTE: Stipulation to Dismiss Complaint Against Various Defendants With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2011
  • NDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:6/1/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2011
  • NOTE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • NOS - Notice Of Settlement (docket date:4/29/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
191 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2010
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:6/14/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • NOTE: CITY OF MESA 05/25/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2010
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:6/10/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2010
  • NOTE: ARCHER WESTERN CONTRACTORS LTD 5/25/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2010
  • 322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss (docket date:5/19/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • LET - Letter (docket date:3/22/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • NOTE: CT CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • LET - Letter (docket date:3/5/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2010
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:2/16/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2010
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:2/16/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less