This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 09/04/2020 at 09:46:33 (UTC).

Aurora Magallanes VS Hector Cuenca Naranjo

Case Summary

On 01/16/2020 Aurora Magallanes filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Hector Cuenca Naranjo. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Lang, Todd and Rassas, Michael. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0216

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Lang, Todd

Rassas, Michael

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Aurora Magallanes

Respondent

Hector Cuenca Naranjo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • HearingEvent: Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • HearingEvent: Open Negotiation; Result: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docket028 - ME: Status Conference Set (docket date:8/6/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • HearingEvent: Resolution Management Conference; Result: Hearing Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Pre Decree Open Negotiations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketORA - Order To Appear (docket date:8/4/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketUPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name (docket date:7/27/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketSTA - Statement (docket date:7/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: PARTIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketAGP - agreement of parties ARFLP69 (docket date:7/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketAFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail (docket date:2/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:2/5/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:2/4/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:1/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:1/17/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:1/17/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:1/17/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:1/17/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:1/17/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:1/17/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less