Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/28/2016 at 23:24:40 (UTC).

Assisted Living Associates L L C VS Leland C Albertson Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2015 Assisted Living Associates L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Leland C Albertson. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Warner, Randall. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6675

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Warner, Randall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Assisted Living Associates L L C

Defendants

Leland C Albertson

Shirley D Albertson

Alan C Bartlett

Vanice R B Bartlett

Doug R Brown

Dorothy J Brown

Wesley E Brown

Alicia Nall Brown

Cristobal Bustamante

Mary Bustamante

Joseph Matthew Crabb

Dana L Christy

Keith Ehrhardt

Mae Nell Ehrhardt

John Gardetto

Lynn T Gardetto

J & L Gardetto L L C

John T Giek

Patricia A Giek

40 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacob Kubert

Defendant Attorneys

Dale Zeitlin

R HILL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2016
  • NDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:6/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • NOTE: Notice of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set (docket date:5/31/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • RES - Response (docket date:4/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • NOTE: PLAINTIFFS Response to Motion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • OCC - Order Continuing On Inactive Calendar (docket date:4/6/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • NOTE: ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE ON DISMISSAL CALENDAR AND TO EXTEND SERVICE DEADLINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • MTD - Motion To Dismiss (docket date:4/4/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • NOTE: Motion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • MCO - Motion To Continue (docket date:4/4/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2015
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:8/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • NOTE: ARCHER V. SHELTON AND BARBARA J. SHELTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • AMC - Amended Complaint (docket date:8/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • NOTE: First Amended Verified Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/2/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • NOTE: LELAND C ALBERTSON JR AND SHIRLEY D ALBERTSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:7/2/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:5/8/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:5/8/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:5/8/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less