This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:02:05 (UTC).

Ashton Ranch Community Homeowners Association Inc VS John D Apolinar

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Ashton Ranch Community Homeowners Association Inc filed an Other lawsuit against John D Apolinar. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Duncan, Sally. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1732

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Duncan, Sally

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashton Ranch Community Homeowners Association Inc

Defendant

John D Apolinar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Philip Brown

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketAAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less