This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/18/2021 at 13:05:55 (UTC).

Ashley R Ryan VS Nolan J Ryan

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 Ashley R Ryan filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Nolan J Ryan. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Wein, Kevin. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0310

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Wein, Kevin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ashley R Ryan

Respondent

Nolan J Ryan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jenny Gadow

Respondent Attorney

Nicholas Boca

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/20/2021

HearingEvent: Trial/Evidentiary Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2021

HearingEvent: Temporary Orders

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2021

DocketNOTE: Reply to Petitioners Expedited Motion to Quash Subpoenas to T-Mobile Verizon Wireless

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2021

DocketREL - Reply (docket date:2/17/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2021

DocketNOTE: FOR TEMPORARY ORDER HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2021

DocketORA - Order To Appear (docket date:2/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2021

DocketNOTE: NOTICE OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO RULE 43

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2021

DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:2/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2021

DocketNOTE: Husbands Response/Objection to Wife's Motion for Temporary Attorneys Fees

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2021

DocketRES - Response (docket date:2/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
150 More Docket Entries
02/05/2020

DocketNOTE: MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE RESTORATION OF FORMER NAME

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2020

DocketRFN - Request To Restore Former Name (docket date:2/10/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2020

DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:1/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2020

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:1/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2020

DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:1/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2020

DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:1/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2020

DocketNOTE: REQUIRING STRICT COMPLIANCE WITH ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2020

DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:1/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2020

DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:1/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2020

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:1/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less