This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 10/30/2020 at 11:43:48 (UTC).

Ashley Goddard VS Courtney Stumpf

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Ashley Goddard filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Courtney Stumpf. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Coffey, Rodrick. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6880

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Coffey, Rodrick

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ashley Goddard

Respondent

Courtney Stumpf

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Alison Briggs

Respondent Attorney

Alexander Poulos

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • HearingEvent: Resolution Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • Docket700 - ME: Resolution Management Conference Set (docket date:10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Response to Petition to Establish Paternity, Legal Decision-Making, Parenting Time and Child Support PD 269 R# 27990085

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/6/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less