This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/19/2020 at 09:37:17 (UTC).

Armida Barrios VS Omar Villegas

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Armida Barrios filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Omar Villegas. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Rassas, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5686

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Rassas, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Armida Barrios

Respondent

Omar Villegas

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • HearingEvent: Decree on Demand - Spanish

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/3/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:10/12/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less